WI SB42 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 36.11 (55), 946.13 (12) (b) 2. and 946.13 (12) (c); to renumber and amend 946.13 (12) (a); to consolidate, renumber and amend 946.13 (12) (b) (intro.) and 1.; and to create 946.13 (12) (a) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: University of Wisconsin research contracts. (FE)
Title
University of Wisconsin research contracts. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb42 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB42.pdf |