WI SB403 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 940.20 (4); to amend 940.20 (4) (title); and to create 940.20 (4) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: battery or threat to a public officer and providing a penalty.
Title
Battery or threat to a public officer and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-10 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-01-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 20, Noes 13 |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-09-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Introduced |