WI SB401 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Passed on December 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-06 - Published 12-4-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Passed on December 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-06 - Published 12-4-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 563.908; to amend 563.907 (1); and to create 563.908 (2) and (3) of the statutes; Relating to: exempting 50/50 raffles from license requirements. (FE)
Title
Exempting 50/50 raffles from license requirements. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-06 | Senate | Published 12-4-2021 |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 12-3-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 106 |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 12-2-2021 |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-10-26 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-10-26 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2021-10-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-10-26 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-10-26 | House | Read a second time |
2021-10-26 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2021-10-21 | House | Placed on calendar 10-26-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-10-21 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-10-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-20-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-10-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Representative Skowronski added as a cosponsor |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Introduced |