WI SB399 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Published 5-5-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Published 5-5-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 32.02 (1), 66.0303 (1) and 71.36 (1m); and to create 66.0304, 71.05 (1) (c) 10., 71.26 (1m) (k) and 71.45 (1t) (k) of the statutes; relating to: authorizing two or more cities, villages, towns, or counties, or a combination of such political subdivisions, to create a commission to issue conduit revenue bonds and exercise eminent domain authority and exempting from taxation interest on such bonds.
Title
Authorizing two or more cities, villages, towns, or counties, or a combination of such political subdivisions, to create a commission to issue conduit revenue bonds and exercise eminent domain authority and exempting from taxation interest on such bonds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | Published 5-5-2010 | |
2010-04-22 | Report approved by the Governor on 4-21-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 205 | |
2010-04-21 | Presented to the Governor on 4-21-2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Report correctly enrolled on 4-20-2010 | |
2010-04-20 | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1) | |
2010-04-15 | Action ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-15 | Assembly amendment 1 concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on calendar 4-15-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-04-14 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-14 | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-04-13 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-13 | Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 98, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-13 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-13 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-13 | Assembly amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-04-13 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on calendar 4-13-2010 by committee on Rules | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-03-29 | Report concurrence as amended recommended by committee on Urban and Local Affairs, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-29 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Urban and Local Affairs, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-23 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-22 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Seidel | |
2010-03-05 | Read first time and referred to committee on Urban and Local Affairs | |
2010-03-05 | Received from Senate | |
2010-03-04 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-03-04 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-04 | Rules suspended | |
2010-03-04 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-03-04 | Senate amendment 2 adopted | |
2010-03-04 | Read a second time | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on calendar 3-4-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-03-03 | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e) | |
2010-03-03 | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e) | |
2010-02-26 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-02-26 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Economic Development, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2010-02-26 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by committee on Economic Development, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken | |
2010-02-23 | Senate amendment 2 offered by Senator Kreitlow | |
2010-02-16 | Senator Vinehout added as a coauthor | |
2010-02-10 | Public hearing held | |
2010-02-10 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-08 | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Kreitlow | |
2010-01-25 | Withdrawn from joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions and rereferred to committee on Economic Development, pursuant to Senate Rule 46 (2)(c) | |
2010-01-15 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-12-14 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-12-10 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-11-18 | Read first time and referred to joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions | |
2009-11-18 | Introduced |