WI SB363 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-6)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-6)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 947.014 of the statutes; Relating to: falsely reporting an emergency and providing a penalty.
Title
Falsely reporting an emergency and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senator Larson added as a coauthor |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Cowles and Wanggaard |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Senator Craig added as a coauthor |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Representative Tusler added as a cosponsor |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb363 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB363.pdf |