WI SB324 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 229.685 (2) and 341.14 (6r) (b) 13. b.; and to create 20.395 (5) (ij) of the statutes; Relating to: proceeds from special registration plates associated with professional baseball park districts and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Proceeds from special registration plates associated with professional baseball park districts and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Leah Vukmir [R] | Rep. Jim Ott [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb324 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB324.pdf |