WI SB316 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-5)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-5)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 302.085 of the statutes; Relating to: the treatment of a pregnant or postpartum person in prison and county jail. (FE)
Title
The treatment of a pregnant or postpartum person in prison and county jail. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor |
2019-08-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Senator Jacque added as a coauthor |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb316 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB316.pdf |