WI SB292 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on May 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-12 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on May 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-12 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 100.171 (3) (f) 1.; to amend 100.171 (3) (b) 1., 100.171 (3) (b) 2. and 100.171 (3) (d); and to create 100.171 (5m) of the statutes; Relating to: notices of eligibility to receive a prize.
Title
Notices of eligibility to receive a prize.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-12-2020 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-3-2020 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:35 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Introduced |