WI SB280 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 238.18 of the statutes; Relating to: rural economic development programs administered by the Wisconsin Economic Development Corporation and farm support grants. (FE)
Title
Rural economic development programs administered by the Wisconsin Economic Development Corporation and farm support grants. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Laid on table |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on the foot of the 11th order of business on the calendar of 4-14-2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-14-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Representative Kitchens added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-04-06 | Senate | LRB correction |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Introduced |