WI SB264 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 938.21 (1) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: hearing timelines for juveniles in custody. (FE)
Title
Hearing timelines for juveniles in custody. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-12-07 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-09-28 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Placed on calendar 9-28-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Introduced |