WI SB219 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-5)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-5)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 106.14 (2); and to create 106.14 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting the Department of Workforce Development from requiring a job seeker to furnish his or her social security number to that department as a precondition to using the services of the job center network, including using the job center network Internet site. (FE)
Title
Prohibiting the Department of Workforce Development from requiring a job seeker to furnish his or her social security number to that department as a precondition to using the services of the job center network, including using the job center network Internet site. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-08-03 | Senate | Senator Lassa added as a coauthor |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development, Public Works, and Military Affairs |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb219 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB219.pdf |