WI SB196 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.490 (1) (title); and to create 20.490 (1) (c), 20.490 (1) (cm), 234.66 and 234.665 of the statutes; Relating to: revolving loan funds administered by the Wisconsin Housing and Economic Development Authority for certain activities of paper mills, a paper science grant, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Revolving loan funds administered by the Wisconsin Housing and Economic Development Authority for certain activities of paper mills, a paper science grant, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Representative Zamarripa added as a cosponsor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb196 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB196.pdf |