WI SB163 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Published 3-22-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Published 3-22-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 15.227 (15) (a) 7. of the statutes; Relating to: membership of the Agricultural Education and Workforce Development Council in the Department of Workforce Development.
Title
Membership of the Agricultural Education and Workforce Development Council in the Department of Workforce Development.
Sponsors
Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Sen. Mark Spreitzer [D] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] |
Rep. Loren Oldenburg [R] | Rep. Clint Moses [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Rep. Todd Novak [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Senate | Published 3-22-2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-21-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 152 |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024 |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2024-01-25 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-01-25 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-25 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-01-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-01-25 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-01-25 | House | Read a second time |
2024-01-23 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:07 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 |
2023-10-19 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2023-09-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 9-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-09-01 | Senate | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor |
2023-08-31 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2023-08-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Introduced |