WI SB161 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 48.21 (6), 48.217 (2), 48.217 (2m) (c), 48.357 (2) (a), 48.357 (2m) (a), 48.437 (2), 938.217 (2), 938.357 (2) (a) and 938.357 (2m) (a); to amend 48.217 (1) (b) 2., 48.357 (1) (am) 1. c., 48.38 (5) (c) 1., 48.38 (5) (d), 48.38 (5m) (d), 48.437 (1) (a) 2., 48.437 (1) (c), 48.73, 938.217 (1) (b) 2., 938.357 (1) (am) 1., 938.38 (5) (c) 1., 938.38 (5) (d) and 938.38 (5m) (d); and to create 48.02 (14k), 48.02 (17t), 48.21 (1) (c), 48.21 (5) (b) 2g., 48.21 (5) (cm), 48.21 (6) (b), 48.217 (1) (b) 3., 48.217 (1) (b) 4., 48.217 (2) (b) and (c), 48.217 (2m) (b) 3., 48.217 (2m) (c) 2. and 3., 48.217 (2v) (d) 1. and 2., 48.32 (1) (b) 1r., 48.32 (1) (cd), 48.33 (4) (cm), 48.33 (4) (cr), 48.355 (2) (b) 6d., 48.355 (2) (cd), 48.357 (1) (am) 1m. and 1r., 48.357 (1) (c) 1r., 48.357 (2) (a) 2., 3. and 4., 48.357 (2) (b) 5. and 6., 48.357 (2m) (a) 2., 48.357 (2v) (a) 5. and 6., 48.38 (1) (ag), 48.38 (1) (ap), 48.38 (1) (c), 48.38 (3m), 48.38 (4) (k), 48.38 (4) (L), 48.38 (5) (bm) 4., 48.38 (5m) (c) 4., 48.437 (1) (a) 3. and 4., 48.437 (2) (b) and (c), 48.437 (2v) (d), 48.48 (20), 48.675, 48.715 (8), 938.02 (14m), 938.02 (17t), 938.21 (1) (c), 938.21 (5) (b) 2g., 938.21 (5) (cm), 938.217 (1) (b) 3. and 4., 938.217 (2) (b) and (c), 938.217 (2m) (b) 3., 938.217 (2v) (d) 1. and 2., 938.32 (1) (c) 1r., 938.32 (1) (cd), 938.33 (4) (cm), 938.33 (4) (cr), 938.355 (2) (b) 6d., 938.355 (2) (cd), 938.357 (1) (am) 1m. and 1r., 938.357 (1) (c) 1r., 938.357 (2) (a) 2., 3. and 4., 938.357 (2) (b) 5. and 6., 938.357 (2m) (a) 2., 938.357 (2v) (a) 5. and 6., 938.38 (1) (ag), 938.38 (1) (as), 938.38 (1) (bp), 938.38 (3m), 938.38 (4) (k), 938.38 (4) (L), 938.38 (5) (cm) and 938.38 (5m) (c) 4. of the statutes; Relating to: qualified residential treatment programs and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Qualified residential treatment programs and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Laid on table |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-11-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Human Services, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Representative Bowen added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Human Services, Children and Families |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced |