WI SB145 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 37-2)
Status: Enrolled on January 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 50.01 (1b), 77.54 (14) (f) 3., 118.2925 (1) (b), 146.89 (1) (r) 8., 252.01 (1c), 440.03 (13) (b) 3., 440.03 (13) (b) 42., 440.08 (2) (a) 4m., 440.08 (2) (a) 50., 441.11 (title), 441.11 (1), 441.11 (3), 441.15, 441.16, 441.19, 448.035 (1) (a), 450.01 (1m) and 655.001 (9); to renumber 655.001 (1); to renumber and amend 146.89 (1) (r) 3., 253.13 (1), 255.06 (1) (d), 441.06 (7) and 441.11 (2); to amend 29.193 (1m) (a) 2. (intro.), 29.193 (2) (b) 2., 29.193 (2) (c) 3., 29.193 (2) (cd) 2. b., 29.193 (2) (cd) 2. c., 29.193 (2) (e), 29.193 (3) (a), 45.40 (1g) (a), 46.03 (44), 50.08 (2), 50.09 (1) (a) (intro.), 50.09 (1) (f) 1., 50.09 (1) (h), 50.09 (1) (k), 50.49 (1) (b) (intro.), 51.41 (1d) (b) 4., 70.47 (8) (intro.), 77.54 (14) (f) 4., 97.59, 102.13 (1) (a), 102.13 (1) (b) (intro.), 1., 3. and 4., 102.13 (1) (d) 1., 2., 3. and 4., 102.13 (2) (a), 102.13 (2) (b), 102.17 (1) (d) 1. and 2., 102.29 (3), 102.42 (2) (a), 106.30 (1), 118.15 (3) (a), 118.25 (1) (a), 118.29 (1) (e), 118.2925 (3), 118.2925 (4) (c), 118.2925 (5), 146.615 (1) (a), 146.82 (3) (a), 146.89 (1) (r) 1., 146.89 (6), 154.01 (1g), 252.07 (8) (a) 2., 252.07 (9) (c), 252.10 (7), 252.11 (2), (4), (5) and (7), 252.11 (10), 252.15 (3m) (d) 11. b. and 13., (5g) (c), (5m) (d) 2. and (e) 2. and 3. and (7m) (intro.) and (b), 252.16 (3) (c) (intro.), 252.17 (3) (c) (intro.), 253.07 (4) (d), 253.115 (4), 253.115 (7) (a) (intro.), 253.15 (2), 255.06 (2) (d), 255.07 (1) (d), 257.01 (5) (a) and (b), 341.14 (1a), (1e) (a), (1m) and (1q), 343.16 (5) (a), 343.51 (1), 343.62 (4) (a) 4., 440.077 (1) (a), 440.077 (2) (c), 440.094 (1) (c) 1., 440.094 (2) (a) (intro.), 440.981 (1), 440.982 (1), 440.987 (2), 441.01 (3), 441.01 (4), 441.01 (7) (a) (intro.), 441.01 (7) (b), 441.06 (3), 441.06 (4), 441.07 (1g) (intro.), (a), (c) and (e), 441.10 (7), 441.18 (2) (a) (intro.), 441.18 (2) (b), 441.18 (3), 448.03 (2) (a), 448.035 (2) to (4), 448.56 (1) and (1m) (b), 448.62 (2m), 448.67 (2), 448.956 (1m), 450.01 (16) (h) 2., 450.01 (16) (hr) 2., 450.03 (1) (e), 450.11 (1g) (b), 450.11 (1i) (a) 1., 450.11 (1i) (b) 2. b., 450.11 (7) (b), 450.11 (8) (e), 450.13 (5) (b), 450.135 (7) (b), 462.04, 655.001 (7t), 655.002 (1) (a), 655.002 (1) (b), 655.002 (1) (c), 655.002 (1) (d), 655.002 (1) (e), 655.002 (1) (em), 655.002 (2) (a), 655.002 (2) (b), 655.003 (1), 655.003 (3), 655.005 (2) (a), 655.005 (2) (b), 655.23 (5m), 655.27 (3) (a) 4., 655.27 (3) (b) 2m., 655.275 (2), 655.275 (5) (b) 2., 961.01 (19) (a) and 961.395; to repeal and recreate 155.01 (1g) (b), 251.01 (1c) and 441.06 (title); and to create 253.115 (1) (f), 253.13 (1) (a), 253.15 (1) (em), 255.06 (1) (f) 2., 440.03 (13) (b) 39m., 440.08 (2) (a) 47r., 441.001 (1c), 441.001 (3c), 441.001 (3g), 441.001 (3n), 441.001 (3r), 441.001 (3w), 441.001 (5), 441.01 (7) (c), 441.09, 441.092 and 655.001 (1g) of the statutes; Relating to: advanced practice registered nurses, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advanced practice registered nurses, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-25 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-17 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-30SenateReport correctly enrolled
2024-01-30SenateLRB correction
2024-01-25SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2024-01-25HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2024-01-25HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2024-01-25HouseRules suspended
2024-01-25HouseOrdered to a third reading
2024-01-25HouseAssembly Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 64, Noes 35
2024-01-25HouseAssembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Subeck
2024-01-25HouseRead a second time
2024-01-23HouseMade a special order of business at 10:06 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23
2024-01-23HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2024-01-23HouseReport without recommendation (Assembly Rule 19) by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 8, Noes 8
2024-01-23HouseExecutive action taken
2024-01-16HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Subeck
2023-11-15HouseRepresentative Dittrich withdrawn as a cosponsor
2023-11-15HousePublic hearing held
2023-10-19HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care
2023-10-17HouseReceived from Senate
2023-10-17SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2023-10-17SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 23, Noes 9
2023-10-17SenateRules suspended to give bill its third reading
2023-10-17SenateOrdered to a third reading
2023-10-17SenateSenate Amendment 2 adopted
2023-10-17SenateSenate Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 23, Noes 9
2023-10-17SenateRead a second time
2023-10-17SenateSenate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Testin
2023-10-17SenatePlaced on the foot of the 10th order of business on the calendar of 10-17-2023
2023-10-17SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Hesselbein, Agard, L. Johnson, Larson, Smith and Taylor
2023-10-16SenatePlaced on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2023-10-06SenateAvailable for scheduling
2023-10-06SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 4, Noes 2
2023-10-04SenateExecutive action taken
2023-09-21SenateFiscal estimate received
2023-05-24SenatePublic hearing held
2023-05-24SenateRepresentative Snyder added as a cosponsor
2023-04-03SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Health
2023-04-03SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb145
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2023/REG/SB145.pdf
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/enrolledbills/2023/REG/SB145.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2023/REG/SB145-SA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2023/REG/SB145-SA2.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2023/REG/SB145-AA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2023/REG/SB145-AA2.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/related/fe/sb145/sb145_dsps.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/related/records/senate/health/1749593.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/lcamendmentmemos/2023/REG/SB145.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/related/records/assembly/health_aging_and_long_term_care/1772622.pdf
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2023/sv0128
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2023/sv0129
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2023/av0143

Bill Comments

feedback