WI SB131 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 344.16 (1); to amend 344.14 (2) (d) and 344.16 (2); and to create 344.16 (1) (a) and (b), 344.16 (2m) and 344.63 (1) (cm) of the statutes; Relating to: self-insurance by religious sects for purposes of motor vehicle financial responsibility and liability insurance requirements. (FE)
Title
Self-insurance by religious sects for purposes of motor vehicle financial responsibility and liability insurance requirements. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-10-16 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Insurance |
2019-10-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-08-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Bernier |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb131 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB131.pdf |