WI SB129 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor
Pending: Senate Licensing, Constitution and Federalism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor
Pending: Senate Licensing, Constitution and Federalism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 49.45 (2) (a) 7m. of the statutes; Relating to: participation in the federal Public Assistance Reporting Information System. (FE)
Title
Participation in the federal Public Assistance Reporting Information System. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-10 | Senate | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Introduced |