WI SB1082 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 66.0422 (2) (c), 66.0422 (4) and 66.0422 (5); and to amend 196.504 (1) (ac) 3. and 196.504 (2) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: broadband expansion grants for cities, villages, towns, and counties and telecommunications-related construction projects of cities, villages, and towns. (FE)
Title
Broadband expansion grants for cities, villages, towns, and counties and telecommunications-related construction projects of cities, villages, and towns. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Representative Madison added as a cosponsor |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Representative Palmeri added as a cosponsor |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities and Technology |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Introduced |