WI SB1015 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 146.98 and 440.10 of the statutes; Relating to: right of health care providers to express professional opinions related to health or medical information or guidance.
Title
Right of health care providers to express professional opinions related to health or medical information or guidance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Introduced |