WI AR24 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: observing February 28, 2022, as Rare Disease Day in Wisconsin.
Title
Observing February 28, 2022, as Rare Disease Day in Wisconsin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Adopted |
2022-02-15 | House | Placed on calendar 2-17-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-01-24 | House | Representative Murphy added as a coauthor |
2022-01-21 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/proposals/reg/asm/resolution/ar24 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2021/REG/AR24.pdf |