WI AJR90 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: proclaiming October 2021 to be Right to Life Month in Wisconsin.
Title
Proclaiming October 2021 to be Right to Life Month in Wisconsin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-10-27 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2021-10-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-10-26 | House | Representatives Steffen and Murphy added as coauthors |
2021-10-21 | House | Placed on calendar 10-27-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-10-19 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-10-19 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr90 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2021/REG/AJR90.pdf |