WI AJR71 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Enrolled on January 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-27 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-27 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: commending Michael R. Lovell as Chancellor of the University of Wisconsin-Milwaukee.
Title
Commending Michael R. Lovell as Chancellor of the University of Wisconsin-Milwaukee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-27 | House | Report correctly enrolled |
2012-01-24 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Concurred in |
2012-01-23 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-24-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2011-11-04 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2011-11-03 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-11-03 | House | Adopted |
2011-11-03 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2011-10-27 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2011-10-27 | House | Introduced |