WI AJR15 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Report correctly enrolled on 3-30-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Report correctly enrolled on 3-30-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: declaring March 7, 2021 to March 14, 2021, as Women in Construction week and celebrating the wide reaching contributions of women in construction.
Title
Declaring March 7, 2021 to March 14, 2021, as Women in Construction week and celebrating the wide reaching contributions of women in construction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-30-2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Concurred in |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-23-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2021-03-17 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-03-17 | House | Adopted |
2021-03-12 | House | Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2021-03-11 | House | Placed on calendar 3-17-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-03-10 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced |