WI AJR120 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: congratulating the Edgewood High School Crusaders girls golf team on winning the team title at the state golf tournament.
Title
Congratulating the Edgewood High School Crusaders girls golf team on winning the team title at the state golf tournament.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-21 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr120 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AJR120.pdf |