WI AB971 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 118.016 (1) (a) and 118.44 (6) (a); to renumber 118.016 (1) (b); to renumber and amend 118.016 (1) (c) and 118.016 (1r); to amend 20.255 (2) (cu), 118.016 (2), 118.44 (3), 118.44 (5) (a), 118.44 (6) (bm) (intro.), 118.44 (6) (bm) 3., 118.60 (7) (e) and 119.23 (7) (e); and to create 118.015 (4) (e), 118.016 (1b), 118.016 (1e) (title), 118.016 (1e) (d), 118.016 (1g) (title), 118.016 (1r) (title), 118.016 (1r) (b) and (c), 118.016 (3) and (4), 118.33 (7), 118.40 (2r) (b) 2. m., 118.40 (2r) (d) 3., 118.40 (2x) (b) 2. m., 118.40 (2x) (d) 3., 118.44 (5) (c), 118.44 (6) (br) and (bw), 118.60 (2) (a) 10., 119.23 (2) (a) 10. and 121.02 (1t) of the statutes; Relating to: promotion of pupils from the third grade to the fourth grade based on passage of the standardized reading test; reading readiness assessments in public schools; grants to increase licensure of reading teachers; sunsetting the Achievement Gap Reduction program; programs to identify and address pupils with dyslexia; parental opt-out of pupils in grades kindergarten to three from statewide examinations; and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Promotion of pupils from the third grade to the fourth grade based on passage of the standardized reading test; reading readiness assessments in public schools; grants to increase licensure of reading teachers; sunsetting the Achievement Gap Reduction program; programs to identify and address pupils with dyslexia; parental opt-out of pupils in grades kindergarten to three from statewide examinations; and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | House | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor |
2022-02-22 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 60, Noes 32, Paired 2 |
2022-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-17 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 8, Noes 5 |
2022-02-17 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 9, Noes 4 |
2022-02-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-02-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wittke |
2022-02-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2022-02-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2022-02-08 | House | Introduced |