WI AB952 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 66.1105 (7) (am) 2.; and to create 66.1105 (6) (a) 14., 66.1105 (6) (a) 15., 66.1105 (6) (am) 2. i., 66.1105 (6) (am) 2. j., 66.1105 (7) (am) 5. and 66.1105 (7) (am) 6. of the statutes; Relating to: lengthening the time during which tax increments may be allocated and expenditures for project costs may be made and extending the maximum life for Tax Incremental Districts Number One and Four in the village of Caledonia. (FE)
Title
Lengthening the time during which tax increments may be allocated and expenditures for project costs may be made and extending the maximum life for Tax Incremental Districts Number One and Four in the village of Caledonia. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Published 4-17-2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 349 |
2018-04-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-12-2018 |
2018-03-29 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-29-2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:31 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 27 |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-20 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 13, Noes 1 |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-02-20 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-02-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced |