WI AB842 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Published 4-9-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Published 4-9-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 302.045 (2) (c), 302.05 (3) (a) 1., 302.113 (9g) (b) (intro.), 973.01 (3g) and 973.01 (3m); and to create 304.02 (1m) and 973.09 (3) (d) 7. of the statutes; Relating to: earned release from parole or extended supervision and discharge from probation. (FE)
Title
Earned release from parole or extended supervision and discharge from probation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 61 N: 31 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Published 4-9-2022 |
2022-04-08 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 227 |
2022-04-04 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-4-2022 by directive of the Speaker |
2022-03-11 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-11-2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-8-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 4, Noes 3 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-01-25 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-25 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 61, Noes 31 |
2022-01-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-01-25 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-25 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-01-25 | House | Read a second time |
2022-01-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-01-20 | House | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-01-20 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 5, Noes 3 |
2022-01-20 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 5, Noes 3 |
2022-01-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-01-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wichgers |
2022-01-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2022-01-11 | House | Representative Dittrich added as a coauthor |
2022-01-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-07 | House | Introduced |