WI AB748 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 36.27 (1) (c) and 36.27 (2) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: tuition rates for children of University of Wisconsin System alumni. (FE)
Title
Tuition rates for children of University of Wisconsin System alumni. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Alex Dallman [R] | Rep. Donna Rozar [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Sen. Dan Feyen [R] |
Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-01-26 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-12-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2021-12-07 | House | Introduced |