WI AB737 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 48.981 (3) (a) 2d., 48.981 (3) (c) 1. a., 938.371 (3) (d) and 948.051 (1); and to create 48.02 (1) (cm), 48.355 (2d) (b) 3m., 48.981 (3) (a) 2. bm. and 938.355 (2d) (b) 3m. of the statutes; Relating to: the crime of child sex trafficking, the inclusion of child sex trafficking in the definition of child abuse, the investigation of a child abuse report in which a person who is not a caregiver of the child is suspected of permitting, allowing, or encouraging the child to engage in prostitution or of child sex trafficking for purposes of a commercial sex act, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
The crime of child sex trafficking, the inclusion of child sex trafficking in the definition of child abuse, the investigation of a child abuse report in which a person who is not a caregiver of the child is suspected of permitting, allowing, or encouraging the child to engage in prostitution or of child sex trafficking for purposes of a commercial sex act, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-02-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Kessler |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-11 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2016-02-11 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2016-02-11 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-02-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-03 | House | Representative Wachs added as a coauthor |
2016-02-01 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Loudenbeck |
2016-01-29 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Loudenbeck |
2016-01-29 | House | Representative Kahl added as a coauthor |
2016-01-27 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-01-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-20 | House | Senator Risser added as a cosponsor |
2016-01-19 | House | Representative C. Taylor added as a coauthor |
2016-01-15 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families |
2016-01-15 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab737 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB737.pdf |