WI AB723 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 59.52 (29) (a), 60.47 (5) and 62.15 (1); to amend 60.47 (2) (a), 60.47 (2) (b), 60.47 (3), 60.47 (4), 60.47 (5) (title), 66.0901 (1) (as), 66.0901 (1m) (a) (intro.), 66.0901 (1m) (b) and 119.04 (1); and to create 59.52 (29) (am), 59.52 (29) (c) 2., 60.47 (1) (am), 60.47 (2m), 60.47 (5) (c), 62.15 (1) (b), 120.12 (5m) and 120.127 of the statutes; Relating to: local government competitive bidding thresholds and requiring school districts to utilize competitive bidding. (FE)
Title
Local government competitive bidding thresholds and requiring school districts to utilize competitive bidding. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-02-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative McGuire |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-14 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-14 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 8, Noes 4 |
2024-02-14 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2024-02-12 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 3) |
2024-02-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Brooks |
2024-01-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-01-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives C. Anderson, Baldeh, Conley and Ratcliff |
2024-01-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brooks |
2024-01-10 | House | Senator Hutton added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-12-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-12-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-12-06 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced |