WI AB722 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Published 3-19-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Published 3-19-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 767.35 (3); and to create 767.333 of the statutes; Relating to: stipulated orders before judgment in actions for divorce, annulment, or legal separation.
Title
Stipulated orders before judgment in actions for divorce, annulment, or legal separation.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Rep. Patrick Snyder [R] | Rep. Barbara Dittrich [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] |
Sen. Eric Wimberger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | House | Published 3-19-2022 |
2022-03-18 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-18-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 204 |
2022-03-15 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-15-2022 |
2022-02-28 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-28-2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2022-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2022-01-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-12-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-11-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Family Law |
2021-11-24 | House | Introduced |