WI AB716 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 341.09 (2m) (a) 2. and 341.09 (2m) (d); and to create 341.09 (2m) (a) 1m. and 341.09 (10) of the statutes; Relating to: issuance of temporary motor vehicle operation plates and permits to dealers and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Issuance of temporary motor vehicle operation plates and permits to dealers and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Snyder [R] | Rep. Clint Moses [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Rep. Lisa Subeck [D] |
Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] | Sen. Brad Pfaff [D] | Sen. Janis Ringhand [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-24 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2022-02-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-02-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-11-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-11-17 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-11-17 | House | Introduced |