WI AB714 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 71.05 (6) (b) 47., 71.05 (6) (b) 48., 71.26 (1) (h) and 71.45 (1) (c) of the statutes; relating to: creating an individual income tax deduction for amounts paid to process certain meat that is donated to a charitable organization and exempting from taxation certain meat processing fees.
Title
Creating an individual income tax deduction for amounts paid to process certain meat that is donated to a charitable organization and exempting from taxation certain meat processing fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-16 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-04-16 | Report passage recommended by committee on Fish and Wildlife, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-31 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-11 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-17 | Public hearing held | |
2010-02-09 | Read first time and referred to committee on Fish and Wildlife | |
2010-02-09 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab714 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB714.pdf |