WI AB711 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 102.07 (12m), 102.125, 102.18 (1) (b), 102.23 (1) (a), 102.28 (2) (c), 102.28 (7) (b), 102.44 (1) (c) and 102.44 (4); to amend 20.445 (1) (ra), 101.654 (2) (b), 102.01 (2) (d), 102.03 (4), 102.04 (1) (a), 102.04 (2m), 102.07 (1) (a), 102.07 (1) (b), 102.07 (3), 102.07 (7) (a), 102.07 (10), 102.077 (1), 102.077 (2), 102.11 (1) (intro.), 102.125 (title), 102.13 (2) (b), 102.13 (2) (c), 102.16 (1m) (a), 102.16 (2) (d), 102.17 (1) (a) 3., 102.17 (4), 102.18 (1) (bg) 1., 102.18 (3), 102.18 (4) (b), 102.21, 102.23 (1) (c), 102.23 (1) (cm), 102.28 (2) (a), 102.28 (2) (b) (title), 102.28 (2) (c) (title), 102.28 (2) (d), 102.28 (7) (a), 102.29 (1) (b) 2., 102.29 (8), 102.31 (2) (b) 2., 102.315 (2), 102.425 (3) (b), 102.425 (4) (a), 102.425 (4) (b), 102.425 (4m) (b), 102.43 (5) (c), 102.44 (1) (ag), 102.44 (1) (ag), 102.44 (1) (am), 102.44 (1) (b), 102.44 (3), 102.65 (4) (intro.), 102.75 (1), 102.75 (1m), 102.75 (2), 102.75 (4), 102.81 (1) (a), 108.10 (4) and 165.60; and to create 102.07 (12m) (a), 102.125 (2), 102.16 (2) (i), 102.28 (2) (bm), 102.28 (2) (c) 2., 102.28 (7) (bm), 102.423, 102.425 (3) (am), 102.44 (1) (c) 2., 102.44 (1) (c) 3., 102.44 (1m), 102.44 (4) (b), 102.44 (4m), 102.445, 102.75 (1g), 102.80 (1) (f) and 102.81 (1) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: various changes to the worker's compensation law, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Various changes to the worker's compensation law, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-02-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-02-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-02-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-01-31 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor |
2014-01-31 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab711 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB711.pdf |