WI AB711 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 779.415 (1) and 779.415 (1m); to amend 779.415 (title) and 779.415 (2); and to create 779.415 (1c) and 779.415 (1g) (c) of the statutes; relating to: vehicle towing and storage liens.
Title
Vehicle towing and storage liens.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-13 | Laid on the table | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on calendar 4-13-2010 by committee on Rules | |
2010-02-26 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-02-26 | Report passage recommended by committee on Transportation, Ayes 11, Noes 0 | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken | |
2010-02-11 | Public hearing held | |
2010-02-09 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation | |
2010-02-09 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab711 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB711.pdf |