WI AB71 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 23.0917 (5t), 24.11 (1) (c), 24.605, 24.61 (2) (a) 10. and 24.61 (2) (cm) 1. to 4.; to renumber and amend 24.61 (2) (cm) (intro.); to amend 23.0917 (8) (d), 24.62 (3), 70.114 (1) (b) 2. and 70.114 (1) (c); and to create 70.114 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: aid payments on, and city, village, town, and county approval of, certain lands purchased by the Department of Natural Resources and restrictions on the purchase of land by the Board of Commissioners of Public Lands. (FE)
Title
Aid payments on, and city, village, town, and county approval of, certain lands purchased by the Department of Natural Resources and restrictions on the purchase of land by the Board of Commissioners of Public Lands. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-05-04 | House | Representative Horlacher added as a coauthor |
2015-04-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Mining and Rural Development |
2015-03-05 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab71 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB71.pdf |