WI AB706 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 102.60 (6) and 103.78 (4); to renumber and amend 102.17 (1) (a), 102.44 (1) (intro.) and 102.44 (1) (a); to amend 102.03 (1) (c) 2., 102.04 (1) (b) 1., 102.11 (1) (intro.), 102.11 (3), 102.16 (2) (b), 102.16 (2m) (b), 102.31 (2) (a), 102.425 (4m) (b), 102.44 (1) (b), 102.50, 102.555 (12) (b), 102.60 (1m) (intro.), 102.75 (2), 102.81 (1) (a), 102.82 (1) and 102.82 (2) (ar); and to create 102.17 (1) (a) 3., 102.43 (9) (d) and 102.44 (5) (g) of the statutes; relating to: various changes to the worker's compensation law.
Title
Various changes to the worker's compensation law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-13 | Laid on the table | |
2010-04-13 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Sherman | |
2010-04-13 | Placed on the calendar of 4-13-2010 following Assembly Bill 700 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on calendar 4-13-2010 by committee on Rules | |
2010-03-31 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-03-31 | Report passage recommended by committee on Labor, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-10 | Executive action taken | |
2010-02-24 | Public hearing held | |
2010-02-24 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-05 | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor | |
2010-02-05 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab706 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB706.pdf |