WI AB701 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-13)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-13)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 30.2065 (1) and 30.2065 (2) (title); to renumber and amend 30.2065 (2); and to create 15.347 (23) and 30.2065 (1g) of the statutes; Relating to: a general permit for hydrologic restoration projects and creating a hydrologic restoration and management advisory council.
Title
A general permit for hydrologic restoration projects and creating a hydrologic restoration and management advisory council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-18-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-13 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Oldenburg and Steineke |
2019-12-23 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment |
2019-12-23 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab701 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB701.pdf |