WI AB670 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 40.22 (1), 40.22 (2m) (intro.), 40.22 (2r) (intro.), 40.22 (3) (intro.), 40.23 (1) (a) (intro.), 40.23 (1) (am) 2., 40.23 (1) (bm), 40.24 (1) (f), 40.25 (2), 40.26 (1m) (a), 40.26 (1m) (b), 40.26 (5) (intro.) and 40.63 (7); and to create 40.26 (6), 40.26 (7) and 40.26 (8) of the statutes; Relating to: increasing the minimum retirement age under the Wisconsin Retirement System; decreasing the minimum break in service for annuitants in the Wisconsin Retirement System who are rehired by a participating employer; and allowing rehired annuitants to elect to not participate in the Wisconsin Retirement System. (FE)
Title
Increasing the minimum retirement age under the Wisconsin Retirement System; decreasing the minimum break in service for annuitants in the Wisconsin Retirement System who are rehired by a participating employer; and allowing rehired annuitants to elect to not participate in the Wisconsin Retirement System. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-03-26 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 8, Noes 6 |
2020-03-26 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 5 |
2020-02-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Felzkowski |
2020-02-05 | House | Representative Born added as a coauthor |
2020-01-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-12-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2019-12-13 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab670 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB670.pdf |