WI AB65 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 23-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 23-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 709.03 (form) G4., G5., G6. and G7 and 709.033 (form) F10. and F11.; to amend 709.02 (1), 709.05 (1), 709.03 (form) F8. and 709.033 (form) E8.; and to create 709.03 (form) G4. and 709.033 (form) F10. of the statutes; Relating to: real estate disclosure reports.
Title
Real estate disclosure reports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-10-21 | House | Placed on calendar 10-26-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-10-21 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-10-21 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2021-08-25 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-05-25 | House | Representative Drake added as a coauthor |
2021-03-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-02-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate |
2021-02-12 | House | Introduced |