WI AB632 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 809.107 (5) (am); to amend 809.107 (5) (am) (title); and to create 48.43 (6) (am) and 809.107 (5) (am) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: duty to participate in an appeal of an order terminating parental rights. (FE)
Title
Duty to participate in an appeal of an order terminating parental rights. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Dittrich |
2021-12-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-12-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-11-30 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Dittrich |
2021-11-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-21 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Family Law |
2021-10-21 | House | Introduced |