WI AB631 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create subchapter XI of chapter 218 [precedes 218.60] of the statutes; Relating to: repair and replacement of implements of husbandry under warranty.
Title
Repair and replacement of implements of husbandry under warranty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-03-26 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2020-03-26 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 3 adoption recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2020-03-26 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2020-02-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Tittl |
2020-01-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Tittl |
2020-01-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tittl |
2019-12-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab631 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB631.pdf |