WI AB631 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 36.11 (22m), 38.12 (12), 118.30 (8) and 120.12 (26) of the statutes; relating to: incorporating financial literacy in public schools' curriculum and statewide standardized examinations and requiring that it be covered during orientation programs at the University of Wisconsin System and the technical colleges. (FE)
Title
Incorporating financial literacy in public schools' curriculum and statewide standardized examinations and requiring that it be covered during orientation programs at the University of Wisconsin System and the technical colleges. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-03-09 | House | Senator Schultz added as a cosponsor |
2012-03-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-03-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-24 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2012-02-24 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab631 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB631.pdf |