WI AB619 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 961.571 (1) (b) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: decriminalizing fentanyl testing strips. (FE)
Title
Decriminalizing fentanyl testing strips. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-20 | House | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-01-20 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2021-11-16 | House | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor |
2021-11-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-11-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-20 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-10-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2021-10-14 | House | Introduced |