WI AB619 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 13.106 (4) (b) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: reports regarding rural and underserved urban medicine programs.
Title
Reports regarding rural and underserved urban medicine programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-05 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2016-02-03 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-01-13 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-12-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2015-12-29 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab619 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB619.pdf |