WI AB578 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Published 4-9-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Published 4-9-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.370 (9) (ma), 157.06 (2) (t), 157.06 (5) (c) and 157.06 (20); and to create 29.024 (5) (f), 29.024 (12), 157.06 (2) (bm), 157.06 (2) (jm), 157.06 (5) (a) 1m. and 343.175 (1v) of the statutes; Relating to: electing to be a donor of an anatomical gift when applying for a hunting, fishing, or trapping license and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Electing to be a donor of an anatomical gift when applying for a hunting, fishing, or trapping license and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Published 4-9-2022 |
2022-04-08 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 220 |
2022-04-04 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-4-2022 by directive of the Speaker |
2022-03-15 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-15-2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | LRB correction |
2022-03-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senator Darling added as a cosponsor |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-8-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues and rereferred to committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 96, Noes 0 |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-23 | House | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and taken up |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:28 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Thiesfeldt and Pronschinske |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-22 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2022-02-22 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-01-18 | House | Representative Shelton added as a coauthor |
2022-01-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-11-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage |
2021-09-22 | House | Introduced |