WI AB575 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 165.755 (1) (b), 302.46 (1) (a), 757.05 (1) (a), 814.63 (1) (c), 814.63 (2), 814.85 (1) (a) and 814.86 (1); and to create 30.68 (1) and 30.80 (2c) of the statutes; Relating to: regulating the operation of recreational vessels carrying persons under the age of ten and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Regulating the operation of recreational vessels carrying persons under the age of ten and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-12-19 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-12-19 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 9, Noes 3 |
2017-12-19 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 4 adoption recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2017-12-19 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2017-12-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-12-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representative Mursau |
2017-12-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Milroy |
2017-11-29 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Mursau and Tusler |
2017-11-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Mursau and Tusler |
2017-11-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-11-08 | House | Representative Tusler added as a coauthor |
2017-11-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage |
2017-10-24 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab575 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB575.pdf |