WI AB572 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 895.5268 of the statutes; Relating to: limiting civil liability for firearm, firearm accessory, and ammunition manufacturers, distributors, importers, trade associations, sellers, and dealers.
Title
Limiting civil liability for firearm, firearm accessory, and ammunition manufacturers, distributors, importers, trade associations, sellers, and dealers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:25 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Magnafici |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 5, Noes 3 |
2021-11-12 | House | Representative Murphy added as a coauthor |
2021-10-27 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-10-13 | House | Senator Wanggaard added as a cosponsor |
2021-10-11 | House | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor |
2021-10-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-09-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-09-22 | House | Introduced |