WI AB539 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Partial veto failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Partial veto failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 980.08 (4) (d), 980.08 (4) (em), 980.08 (4) (f) 1., 980.08 (5m) and 980.105 (2m); to renumber and amend 980.08 (4) (f) (intro.) and 980.08 (4) (f) 2., 3. and 4.; to consolidate, renumber and amend 980.08 (4) (cm) and (e); to amend 809.30 (2) (d), 967.06 (2) (b), 977.02 (2m), 977.02 (3) (intro.), 977.05 (4) (gm), 977.05 (4) (h), 977.06 (2) (a), 977.06 (2) (am), 977.07 (1) (a), 977.07 (1) (c), 977.075 (4), 977.08 (1), 977.08 (2) (intro.), 977.085 (3), 980.03 (2) (a) and 980.08 (4) (g); and to create 20.435 (2) (gz), 51.61 (1) (z), 977.05 (4) (i) 9., 980.0305, 980.08 (4) (dm) 3. and 980.105 (2) of the statutes; Relating to: plans for supervised release of sexually violent persons, representation of sexually violent persons by the state public defender, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Plans for supervised release of sexually violent persons, representation of sexually violent persons by the state public defender, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in as amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Partial veto failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2018-05-08 | House | Partial veto placed on calendar 5-8-2018 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2018-03-28 | House | Published 3-29-2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Report approved by the Governor with partial veto on 3-28-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 184 |
2018-03-27 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-27-2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-27-2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | LRB correction |
2018-03-21 | House | Received from Senate: Senate recedes from its postion on (Senate Amendment 1) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate recedes from its position on Senate Amendment 1 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly (Senate Amendment 1 nonconcurred in) |
2018-02-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-21 | House | Senate Amendment 1 nonconcurred in |
2018-02-20 | House | Received from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate amendment 1 adopted) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Representative Loudenbeck added as a coauthor |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senator Ringhand added as a cosponsor |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Judiciary and Public Safety and rereferred to committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-01-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-01-16 | House | Representative Thiesfeldt added as a coauthor |
2018-01-16 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 89, Noes 5 |
2018-01-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-01-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-01-16 | House | Read a second time |
2018-01-11 | House | Placed on calendar 1-16-2018 by Committee on Rules |
2018-01-11 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-01-10 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Corrections, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2018-01-10 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Corrections, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2018-01-10 | House | Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2018-01-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Schraa and Kleefisch |
2017-12-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-11-28 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2017-11-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-17 | House | Representative Schraa added as a coauthor |
2017-10-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Corrections |
2017-10-16 | House | Introduced |