WI AB536 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-3)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-3)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 346.63 (2) (c), 346.63 (6) (d), 346.65 (2) (am) 4m. and 973.09 (2) (am); and to amend 48.685 (5) (bm) 4., 48.685 (5) (br) 6., 346.65 (2) (am) 4., 346.65 (2) (am) 5., 346.65 (2) (am) 6., 346.65 (2) (am) 7., 346.65 (2) (dm), 346.65 (2) (f) 2., 346.65 (2c), 346.65 (2g) (a), 346.65 (2g) (ag), 346.65 (2j) (cr) and 346.65 (7) of the statutes; Relating to: penalties for, and elements of, certain operating-while-intoxicated offenses and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Title
Penalties for, and elements of, certain operating-while-intoxicated offenses and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-26 | House | Representative Kremer added as a coauthor |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-01-15 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2016-01-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-01-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-12-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-12-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-12-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-12-10 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety and referred to committee on Judiciary pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2015-12-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-11-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2015-11-24 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab536 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB536.pdf |